judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WAYNE POWERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1095
Short Caption:WAYNE POWERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3407-89Filed Date:09/18/1989

Opening Event Date:09/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPowers, WayneN
Page Kennedy NN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POWERS, WAYNE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/12/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 TO SUPP THE REC; CLK TO FILE NOTE - 02 ATTACHMENTS TO APLT'S MOTION NOTE - 02 (COUNSEL'S SENTENCING LETTER NOTE - 03 TO JUDGE SHUKER AND TWO VICTIM NOTE - 03 IMPACT LTRS SUBMITTED BY THE NOTE - 04 GOV'T) AS A SUPP REC; BRIEF OF NOTE - 04 APLE REMAINS DUE BY 6/14/90.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/16 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KENNEDYP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CORKENC FOR - APPELLEE
09/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD DSA
01/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/11/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD R
02/13/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (21-PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD RT
02/14/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 25, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD BA
04/02/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/25/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD V
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (25-PGS/WHALEN) JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/10/90 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 042590 SCHPRD BA
05/01/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR UP TO AND INCLUDING 5/10/90. NFX PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 051090 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1990APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD TO
06/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (ATTACHMENTS TO APLT'S 5/10/90 MO TO SUPP THE RECORD). CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-12-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BE
07/06/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 07-12-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD GR
07/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-26-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD BE
07/27/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF. CASE SCHEDULD FOR CONS AS SOON AS BUS OF CRT PERMITS. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD GR
10/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990LETTER GRANT APLT'S REQUEST TO ARGUE. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 102290 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990RECEIVED APLT REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO FILE LODG REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 110590 SCHPRD VS
11/09/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/16/1990ARGUED PANELBEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AFFIRMING JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 588 A.2d 1166
04/03/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 0866
04/17/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REHEAR/REHEAR EB ON OR BEFORE MAY 1, 1991. MEH PANELJWR SCDATE 042491 SCHPRD CHECK
06/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD