judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SEAN B. BUTLER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1149
Short Caption:SEAN B. BUTLER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4716-88Filed Date:09/27/1989

Opening Event Date:09/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/10/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/11/1991
Argued/Submitted:06/11/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/14/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSean B. Butler N
Kenneth D. AuerbachNY
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Nancy R. Page NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BUTLER, SEAN B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANTOINE HAYES NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 10/31/90 ORD:GRANTG MO OF COUN NOTE - 02 TO WITHDRAW AS COUN FOR APLT & NOTE - 03 APPTMNT OF VERONICE A. HOLT, NOTE - 03 ESQ, IS HEREBY VAC & WILLIAM NOTE - 04 S PHYNE, ESQ., IS APPOINTED TO NOTE - 04 REPRESENT APLT HEREIN. FORMER NOTE - 05 COUN TO TRANSMIT ALL DOCUMNTS NOTE - 05 TO NEWLY-APPOINTED COUN; F/O NOTE - 06 BRF OF APLT TO BE FILED W/IN NOTE - 06 40 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/06/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - RHYNEW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - PAGEN FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 HOLTV VACATED 10/31/90
09/27/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VERONICE A. HOLT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 102089 SCHPRD DSA
10/24/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR GRAYBILL CERTIFICATION OF 8/23/89 PROC. (CASE NOT CALLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
11/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(21 PGS/BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD RT
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(25 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(37 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (57 PGS/MITCHELL) AD (SEE 89-626 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL APRIL 1, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BA
01/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(18 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 030490 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD U
04/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(5 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 031790 SCHPRD RT
04/10/1990RECORD COMPLETED
09/18/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELFF SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD CHECK
10/11/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM S. RHYNE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 6 GW PANELRO SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD GG
12/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121090 SCHPRD BA
12/31/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 01/10/91. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 121290 SCHPRD GR
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/14/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 011091 SCHPRD BA
01/14/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1991ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF.FO APLE BRF TO BE FLD W/IN 30 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 013191 SCHPRD GR
03/11/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/11/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/11/1991ARGUED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIin U.S. Supreme Court # 92-6293. (denied 11/30/92.)
08/10/1992LETTER OF APPELLANT IN RE: to appointment of counsel & extension of time to file a petition.
09/16/1992ORDER that appellant's request for appointment of counsel is denied to the extent that counsel be appointed to pursue further relief within this court. See Wise v. U.S., 522 A.2d 898. Further ordered that appellant may file a pro se petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc pursuant to Rule 40 within 30 days from the date of this order. Further ordered that the request for appointment of counsel is granted to the extent that Kenneth D. Auerbach, Esquire, is hereby appointed as counsel to represent appellant for the purpose of deciding whether to file a petition for certiorari in the U.S. Supreme Court. (ROTEST)
09/16/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Kenneth D. Auerbach, Esq. (Petition for Writ of Certiorari)
09/18/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to clarify court's September 16, 1992 order.
10/22/1992ORDER grant appellant's motion to clarify this court's order dated 9/16/92. Nothing in Wise v. U.S., 522 A.2d 898 (D.C. 1987), precludes counsel from filing a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc on appellant's behalf. Further ordered, sua sponte, that newly-appointed counsel for appellant may file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc with this court within 21 days from the date of this order. (ROTEST)
10/30/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIin U.S. Supreme Court # 92-6293. (denied 11/30/92.)
12/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED
01/05/1993COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI