judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOLDBERG VS. LAND TITLE OF NEVADA

Case Information: 42752
Short Caption:GOLDBERG VS. LAND TITLE OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A463619Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/22/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/05/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sheldon F. Goldberg--check no. 01110.
02/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-02302
03/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Partially Dismissing Appeal and Directing Transmission of Record. Our review of the documents submitted under NRAP 3(e) reveals that a written order awarding attorney fees has apparently not yet been entered. Consequently, it appears that this appeal is premature with respect to the attorney fees order, so we dismiss it in part. With respect to the December 29, 2003 dismissal order, we conclude that our review of the complete record is warranted. Record due in District Court Case No.A463619: 120 days. fn4[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 04-04807
04/02/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 04-06107
04/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 04-06452
06/22/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 04-11344
06/22/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/12/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre.
09/09/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellants must file the appeal statement on or before 10/19/05. No response required unless ordered by this court. (Pilot program civil appeal statement mailed to proper person appellants.) 05-17838
10/21/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-20926
05/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Response. Respondent's response due: 30 days. No extensions of time shall be granted to respondents absent extreme and unforseeable circumstances. 06-11055
06/22/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent Michael F. Bohn's Response. 06-12957
06/22/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent James J. Ream, Esq.'s Answering Brief. 06-12958
06/26/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-13124
07/12/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Petitioners' Petition to Strike. 06-14396
01/17/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Petition to Preserve Critical Testimony. 07-01128
01/17/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice to Take Deposition (Beverly Cooney.) 07-01129
01/17/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice to take Deposition (Gerald Cooney.) 07-01130
01/17/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Commission to take Out-of-State Deposition of Beverly Cooney. 07-01132
01/17/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Commission to take Out-of-State Deposition of Gerald Cooney. 07-01134
02/01/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent Michael F. Bohn's Opposition to Petition to Preserve Testimony. 07-02590
02/07/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's summary judgment and attorney fee order." fn14[We deny, as moot, appellants' petition to reinstate attorney fee filed on April 2, 2004, petition to strike filed July 12, 2006, petition to preserve critical testimony filed January 17, 2007, and motions for commission to take out-of-state depositions filed January 17, 2007.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-03059
02/22/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from B.A. Goldberg (check).
02/22/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Petitioner Goldberg's Petition for Rehearing. 07-04266
02/22/2007MotionFiled Motion. Defendant Land Title's Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements. 07-04277
02/26/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Petitioner Goldberg's Petition for Rehearing Appendix to Petitioners' Briefs' filed on February 20, 2007. 07-04588
03/27/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-06916
04/24/2007RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $72.00. 07-08196
04/24/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs distributed with Remittitur. 07-08172
04/24/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/01/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2007. 07-08172