judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL C. FOSTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1185
Short Caption:PAUL C. FOSTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7133-88Filed Date:09/29/1989

Opening Event Date:09/29/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul C. Foster N
David E. Mehler YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Lynn Leibovitz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOSTER, PAUL C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
09/29/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID MEHLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
11/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (5 PGS. -- SWAGERTY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 112889 SCHPRD R
01/04/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO REMOVE MO FROM CAL. AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (22 PGS. -- KACZOROWSKI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
01/31/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD U
04/03/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (10-PGS/HUNT) JT PANEL SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (15 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990RECORD COMPLETED
05/08/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD BA
06/07/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-9-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 060790 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1990ORDER GRNT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 07-09-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062590 SCHPRD GR
07/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BE
07/09/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1992REMANDED Order RM case for further consideration as set forth in opinion filed (ST WG RY)