judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SYLVIN M. STREET V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1184
Short Caption:SYLVIN M. STREET V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Kidnapping
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14213-87Filed Date:10/03/1989

Opening Event Date:10/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/04/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/15/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/05/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/05/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSylvin M. Street N
Jacqueline A. Baillargeon YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Bernadette SargeantYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STREET, SYLVIN M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/11/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BAILLARGEONJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SARGEANTB FOR - APPELLEE
10/03/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/20/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD DSA
10/27/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 100489 SCHPRD R
01/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (345-PGS/BURNS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(96 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD RT
01/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD BA
02/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (679-PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(133 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990RECORD COMPLETED
06/20/1990ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD U
07/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(4 PGS - GOAD) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD RT
07/30/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 30, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 073090 SCHPRD BA
08/13/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/30/90; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD B
08/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 083090 SCHPRD BA
12/13/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD U
01/14/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-14-91 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD BA
01/23/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 2/14/91. NFX. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 011591 SCHPRD B
02/14/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 28, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 021491 SCHPRD BA
02/28/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF, LODGED BRF FL & APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS OF ORD. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 030591 SCHPRD B
04/15/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041591 SCHPRD BE
04/15/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/27/1991LETTER FROM ATTY BAILARGEON RE AVAILABILITY FOR ORAL ARGUMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991LETTER FROM APLT RE DATES HE WILL NOT BE AVIALABLE FOR ORAL ARUG 11/6/91 TO 12/6/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1991CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING MEMO FROM COUNSEL FOR APLT PURSUANT TO RULE(28)K KHO PANEL SCDATE 110491 SCHPRD MEMO
11/04/1991ORDER APLT'S UNOPP MOT FOR LV TO FLE REPLY BRF, LODGED REPLY BRF KHO PANELROSTSC SCDATE 110491 SCHPRD O
11/04/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF KHO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/05/1991ARGUED PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE
01/15/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 0092
02/05/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD