judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE BUIE, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1151
Short Caption:GEORGE BUIE, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5207-88Filed Date:09/26/1989

Opening Event Date:09/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/05/1992
Argued/Submitted:11/24/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge Buie, Jr.N
Kevin Oliver YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Larry J. Gusman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BUIE JR., GEORGE UNITED STATES
01/01/19022/13 MMP
09/26/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) KEVIN OLIVER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 102089 SCHPRD DSA
11/13/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL 18 PGS RHOADES/AJ PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-30-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 1/30/90. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 013090 SCHPRD BA
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD U
02/22/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(166 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1990RECORD COMPLETED
04/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 45 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR 30 DAYS. NFX PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 052990 SCHPRD BA
06/11/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR A PERIOD OF 10 DAYS. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 20 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD BA
07/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF REQUESTED TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ORDER (RT COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD U
11/02/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR D.C. JANIFER FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE 7/13/91 PROC. TO 8/31/91 PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1991ORDER DENY MO OF CT RPTR JANIFER FOR EXT. F/O RT DUE FORTHWITH PMB PANELJWR SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (33-PGS/BURNS/7/13/89) AJ PANEL SCDATE 062991 SCHPRD RT
01/03/1992ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 081691 SCHPRD U
02/13/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE RJG PANEL SCDATE 021292 SCHPRD BA
03/17/1992counsel for appellant shall file the brief within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so may result in his appointment being vacated and his name being removed from the panel of attorneys authorized to receive appointments under the Criminal Justice Act. (By J. Rogers)
04/02/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
04/02/1992RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/23/1992ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFLodged brief of appellant is filed. Brief of appellee shall be filed by May 6, 1992.
04/23/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/05/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/05/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/08/1992FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
11/24/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/24/1992ARGUED TE ST KG Kevin Oliver, Esq. for appellant; Larry J. Gusman, Esq. for appellee.
11/27/1992AFFIRMED MOJ affirming the judgment of conviction. (TE ST KG)
12/22/1992MANDATE ISSUED