judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHAWN F. BURTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1181
Short Caption:SHAWN F. BURTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10679-89Filed Date:10/06/1989

Opening Event Date:10/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShawn F. Burton N
David A. CarrNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BURTON, SHAWN F. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 103189 JMT: APLT MO FOR EX- NOTE - 01 PEDITED APPEAL OF ORDER IMPOS- NOTE - 02 ING BOND TREATED AS MO FOR NOTE - 02 SUM REV; 89-1159 & 89-1181 NOTE - 03 ARE CONSOLIDATED; FO APLT'S MO NOTE - 03 FOR SUM REV DENIED; FO & A NOTE - 04 ORDER ON APPEAL IS SUMMARILY NOTE - 04 AFFIRMED. NOTE - 05 CON: 89-1159 NOTE - 05
10/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPEAL FROM ORDER IMPOSING BOND PENDING TRIAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPEAL FROM ORDER IMPOSING BOND PENDING TRIAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (16 PGS - GOAD) GG PANEL SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1989AFFIRMED SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. MEH PANELNWFEST SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD TMC
10/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
11/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD