judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON VS. JOHNSON

Case Information: 42762
Short Caption:JOHNSON VS. JOHNSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50648
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0300672Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:HardestyCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice HardestyPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/22/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/06/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Erika Johnson - money order # 06-814130487.
02/06/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-02398
02/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. DV0300672: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 04-03260
03/22/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-05340
03/22/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/07/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Appellant requests and consents that Jeffrey S. Blanck of Jenkins Law Office, be substituted in the place and stead of Erika Johnson as attorney of record. 04-08531
06/11/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Automatice Stay. 04-10849
09/09/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 6, 2004, this appeal was docketed as a proper person appeal. The record was filed in this court on March 22, 2004. On June 11, 2004, respondent filed a 'Notice of Automatic Stay.' On March 2, 2005, appellant submitted a proper person document informing this court that the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada had dismissed respondent's bankruptcy case. fn1[The clerk shall file the proper person document received on March 2, 2005, entitled 'Notice of Dismissal of Respondent's Bankruptcy Petition.' We decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person.] On May 7, 2004, a document entitled 'Substitution of Attorney' was filed stating that appellant consents to Jeffrey S. Blanck representing her in this appeal. We direct appellant to file the docketing statement and we reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement, request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a), shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). The parties shall not file appendices with their briefs but should cite to the record that was filed in this court on March 22, 2004. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person 'Motion for Stay Pending Appeal' received on March 2, 2005. Appellant shall address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-17921
09/09/2005Other Other. Returned unfiled to appellant Erika Marie Johnson, the proper person Motion for Stay Pending Appeal received on March 2, 2005 with a copy of the 09/09/05 order and without a letter.
10/07/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts.
10/21/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Erika Marie Johnson in proper person in place and stead of Jeffrey S. Blanck (formerly with Jenkins Law Office). 05-20951
10/21/2005Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice of Stay in Bankruptcy Proceedings. 12/30/05 order-fn1: filed proper person notice.jcr 05-20953
12/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw and Assigning Appeal to Civil Pilot Program. The clerk shall remove Mr. Blanck as counsel for appellant in this appeal. We vacate the portions of our September 9, 2005, order that directed Mr. Blanck to file a docketing statement and to request transcripts. Appellant has submitted a proper person 'Notice of Stay in Bankruptcy Proceedings' document. fn1[The clerk shall file the proper person document received on October 21, 2005. We decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person except as expressly provided in this order.] The automatic bankruptcy stay does not appear to be applicable to this case and we decline to stay this appeal and it shall proceed. We have decided to include this appeal in the pilot program. Appellant shall complete, file and serve the enclosed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement in compliance with the instructions contained therein within 40 days from the date of this order. Respondent is not required to file a response to the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement unless ordered to do so by this court. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-25419
12/30/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice of Stay in Bankruptcy Proceedings. 05-20953
02/08/2006BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 06-02791
03/10/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Respondent. 06-05230
07/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Staying Appellate Proceedings. We stay further proceedings in this appeal until the bankruptcy stay is lifted or the bankruptcy proceedings are resolved. Respondent: 90 days to file status report and each 90 days thereafter until further order of this court. Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. 06-13894
10/04/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. of Case no. BK-N-05-50438-GWZ 06-20374
11/29/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Hardesty.
12/11/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Tommy Lee Johnson substitutes himself in pro per in place of attorney Margaret Evans. 06-25308
02/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." This dismissal is without prejudice to appellant's right to move for reinstatement of the appeal upon either the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings.] NNP07-WM/RP/NS 07-03282
03/07/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04884
03/07/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/15/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 12, 2007. 07-04884