judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH P. WALTON, III. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1179
Short Caption:JOSEPH P. WALTON, III. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6345-86Filed Date:10/05/1989

Opening Event Date:10/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph P. Walton, IIIN
Howard B. Katzoff NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALTON III, JOSEPH P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/11/90 ORD: GRANTG APLE'S MO NOTE - 01 TO DEFER RULING ON MO FOR NOTE - 02 REMAND; APLE TO FILE STMT W/IN NOTE - 02 20 DAYS ADVISING THIS CT OF NOTE - 03 THE STATUS OF THE PROCEEDINGS NOTE - 03 IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 04 12/14/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 04 FOR REMAND & REC ON APPEAL IS NOTE - 05 REMANDED TO TRL CRT; F/O THAT NOTE - 05 UPON COMPLETION OF THE PROC NOTE - 06 ON REMAND, CLK OF SUPER CRT TO NOTE - 06 TRANSMIT REC OF THESE PROCEEDG NOTE - 07 TO THIS CRT AS A SUPMNTAL REC. NOTE - 07
10/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HOWARD B. KATZOFF, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD CHECK
11/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (19 PGS - SHELTON) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD R
02/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(14 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(55 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO DEFER RULING ON MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 031490 SCHPRD OPE
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(68 PGS/WHALEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(59 PGS/GALLO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD TO
05/07/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND JT PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD ANSE
05/17/1990MEMORANDUM OF APLT INSUPPORT OF MO FOR REMAND AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT SUBMISSION OF SUPPLE- MENTAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 7. GW PANELPC SCDATE 111490 SCHPRD VS
02/06/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (JUDGEMENT & COMMITMENT/ PROBATION ORD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/17/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO WITHDRAW APPEAL AND CASE DISMISSED. AD PANELRO SCDATE 041091 SCHPRD GR
04/17/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD