judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FREDERICK BURGESS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1152
Short Caption:FREDERICK BURGESS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13058-88Filed Date:09/27/1989

Opening Event Date:09/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/15/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrederick Burgess N
Marvin E. Clemons YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Helen M. Bollwerk YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BURGESS, FREDERICK UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DARYL LOGAN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 09/18/90 ORD: SS, APPEALS NO. NOTE - 02 89-747 & 89-1152 ARE CONSOL & NOTE - 03 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO PREPARE & NOTE - 03 TRANSMIT REC IN NO. 89-747 TO NOTE - 04 THIS COURT FORTHWITH; F/O THAT NOTE - 04 APLE BRF DUE IN NO. 89-747 W/I NOTE - 05 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CONS: 89-747 NOTE - 06
09/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARVIN E. CLEMONS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 102089 SCHPRD DSA
11/02/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (6 PGS/RONAN) RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
11/15/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (458 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD RT
11/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (5 PGS. -- BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRPITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD U
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (10 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031790 SCHPRD RT
04/04/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (16 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031890 SCHPRD RT
05/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS FROM 5/1/90 PF PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 6/11/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
06/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD BA
07/10/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-9-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BE
08/02/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF TO 8/09/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD B
08/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD BE
09/18/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 THRU 06 GW PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-747 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF IN 89-747 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 591 A.2d 850
05/21/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 1372 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0000 (DS/CC IN PART)
06/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD