judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIMBALL (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34769
Short Caption:KIMBALL (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900594CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08259
09/07/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 24, 1999 and June 29, 1999. Court Reporter: Deborah Middleton Greco. 99-08376
09/07/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 1, 1999 and August 3, 1999. Court Reporter: Stephanie Zolkowski. 99-08377
09/09/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 30, 1999. Court Reporter: Corrie L. Wolden. 99-08498
09/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-09308
10/20/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 26, 1999. 99-10186
10/26/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10500
04/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 00-05865
05/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07566
05/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 10, 2000. 00-07566