judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: VINCENT J. KROCKA

Case Information: 10-BG-0872
Short Caption:IN RE: VINCENT J. KROCKAClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN209-10Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentVincent J. Krocka NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida disbarring respondent.
08/04/2010RECEIVED a copy of a letter from the Office of Bar Counsel to respondent advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation to the Court that respondent be suspended on an interim basis pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and of respondent's obligation to file an affidavit pursuant to section 14 (g).
08/09/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida disbarring respondent from the practice of law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the responde. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the relevant portions of the record of proceeding in the other disciplining cour, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
08/20/2010AFFIDAVIT of respondent. *Referred by the Office of Bar Counsel.
09/22/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
09/23/2010TMC - notices of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statements of Bar Counsel - proposed orders
10/21/2010FiledDISBARMENT ORDERED that Vincent J. Krocka, Esquire is disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's disbarment will be deemed to have commenced on August 16, 2010, the date he filed his D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g) affidavit. (RD,BE,TE)