judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. B. TEMPLETON v. M. H. WOLVERTON, M. B. MOORE

Case: A-18
A-18
01/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
J. B. TEMPLETON
M. H. WOLVERTON, M. B. MOORE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/29/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/14/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/09/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/15/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/24/1944Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
04/20/1944Letter Filed
03/29/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1944Response to Brief filed
02/09/1944Supplemental Brief filed
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/15/1944Response to Petition
01/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. B. MooreRespondent
M. H. WolvertonRespondent
J. B. TempletonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information