judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARKUS YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1121
Short Caption:MARKUS YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10742-88Filed Date:09/21/1989

Opening Event Date:09/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/24/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarkus Young N
John T. Riely YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YOUNG, MARKUS AKA MARCUS T. YOUNG UNITED STATES
09/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN T. RIELY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD R
03/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE QUEEN DATED 2-26-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (348 PGS. -- FARMER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD RT
05/25/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 17, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063090 SCHPRD BE
07/06/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 07-17-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070390 SCHPRD GR
07/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071790 SCHPRD BE
08/08/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWWGKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWWGKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/24/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD