judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA TRAILS VS. STRATOSPHERE LEASING

Case Information: 44713
Short Caption:NEVADA TRAILS VS. STRATOSPHERE LEASINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A482165Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/01/2005 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/30/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/18/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John R. Hawley, Ltd.--check no. 1791.
02/18/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-03311
03/01/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-03964
03/01/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/25/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reduce Supersedeas Bond to Reasonable Amount and for Emergency Continuation of Stay Pending Appeal while this Court considers the Motion to Reduce the Bond Herein. 05-05843
03/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting a Temporary Stay. Appellant has filed a motion for reduction of a supersedeas bond, and for a continuation of a stay of execution of judgment pending resolution of this appeal. Cause appearing, we defer ruling upon appellant's motion pending the filing of respondent's response. Respondent shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response to appellant's motion. Pending receipt of respondent's response and further order of this court, we temporarily stay execution of the district court's judgment entered February 3, 2005, the district court's decision entered March 4, 2005, and the district court's order entered March 14, 2005, requiring appellant to post a supersedeas bond in the sum of $696,000.00 by March 28, 2005. 05-05883
03/25/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Receipt of Copy of Motion. 05-05917
03/28/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. 05-06007
04/04/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlarement of Time in Which to File Respondent's Opposition Brief. 05-06608
04/07/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed April 4, 2005. Respondent shall have until April 14, 2005, to file and serve its response to reduce supersedeas bond. 05-06820
04/18/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Reduce Supersedeas Bond Statement of the Case. 05-07512
05/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Reduce Supersedeas Bond. Presently before the court is appellant Nevada Trails-Las Vegas, Inc.'s motion to reduce the supersedeas bond amount. Respondent Stratosphere Leasing, LLC has filed an opposition. We grant Nevada Trails' motion, and we remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of redetermining the amount of Nevada Trails' undertaking in accordance with this order. The district court shall, within 30 days of this order's date, complete the redetermination and allow Nevada Trails 30 days thereafter to post the redetermined undertaking and submit proof to the clerk of this court that the undertaking has been posted. This court's temporary stay will expire 60 days from the date of this order or upon proof submitted to this court that the redetermined undertaking has been posted, whichever occurs first. 05-09088
06/20/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 11, 2005. 05-12103
08/17/2005Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 29, 2005 (submitted in response to this court's order of May 10, 2005). 05-16328
08/17/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: August 2, 2005. 05-16329
08/29/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (John R. Hawley, Esq.) 05-17075
09/19/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 05-18583
10/06/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-19857
10/14/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-20335
10/26/2005Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/14/05 addressed to attorney Lawrence Semenza remailed to corrected address.
11/16/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
01/12/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 13, 2006. 06-00862
02/15/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-03327
02/15/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 thorugh 3. 06-03328
02/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to request transcripts. Failure to comply timely may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-03994
03/02/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/12/04, 07/06/04, and 01/24/05. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 06-04706
03/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Request for Transcript. 06-05342
03/15/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 14, 2006. 06-05596
04/14/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-07914
04/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering brief due: May 15, 2006. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-08170
05/19/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-10602
05/30/2006MotionFiled Motion. Barron & Pruitt. 06-11286
06/13/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 19, 2006. 06-12340
07/18/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (second request.) 06-14930
08/17/2006BriefReceived Reply Brief. 06-17146
08/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant Mr. Barron's motion to withdraw. The clerk shall substitute John R. Hawley Ltd. in the place of Barron & Pruitt as counsel for appellant. fn1[Lawrence J. Semenza shall also remain as counsel of record for appellant.] The clerk shall file the reply brief received on August 17, 2006. 06-18056
08/30/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-17146
05/30/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-11856
05/30/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP07-MG/MD/MC
09/25/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. 07-21228
10/23/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22172
10/23/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2007. 07-22172