Case Information: 44712 | |||
Short Caption: | REDMOND VS. CLARK CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A482082 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/01/2005 / Aurbach, Phillip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/09/2006 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hardy Hardy & McNicholas--check no. 4989. | ||
02/18/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03284 | |
03/01/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/15/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | ||
03/24/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-05751 | |
06/23/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 05-12390 | |
06/30/2005 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 05-12968 | |
07/26/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | ||
08/01/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 05-15200 | |
09/30/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-19445 | |
09/30/2005 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. | ||
12/05/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondent Clark County's Motion to Extend the Time for Filing of its Answering Brief. | 05-23743 | |
12/05/2005 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. | 05-23744 | |
12/06/2005 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. Received two additional copies. | 05-23744 | |
12/07/2005 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answring brief received on December 5, 2005. | 05-23960 | |
12/07/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 05-23744 | |
12/21/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 05-24838 | |
03/09/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 06-05155 | |
03/09/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/26/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-19739 | |
10/24/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-20948 | |
10/24/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/03/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 2006. | 06-20948 |