Case Information: 42765 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (CHARLES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193971 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-02547 | |
03/03/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 12, 13, 2003, Vol. I and November 13, 2003, Vols. II. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 04-04019 | |
03/25/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File14 Page Fast Track Statement. Granted: 14 pages. | 04-05642 | |
03/25/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-05643 | |
03/25/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 04-05644 | |
04/16/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-07012 | |
12/23/2004 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing/Rose/Douglas. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Shearing/Rose/Douglas. 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 96. SNP04D/Shearing/Rose/Douglas. | 04-23378 | |
01/18/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-00774 | |
01/18/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/25/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction made on page 6 of the opinion filed December 23, 2004. | ||
01/28/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 20, 2005. | 05-00774 |