Case: 06-0329
06-0329
04/25/2006
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
CAROLE KEETON STRAYHORN, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
METROMEDIA RESTAURANT SERVICES, INC., S&A RESTAURANT CORPORATION, AND STEAK & ALE OF TEXAS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
08/11/2006 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of Metromedia Restaurant Services, et al. Response to pet/rev. | |
05/18/2006 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition for review. | |
05/18/2006 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for review filed on behalf of Carole Keeton Strayhorn, et al. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
01/30/2007 | Case Stored | G02/7-B-3 | | |
01/11/2007 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent to the Court of Appeals. | | |
10/27/2006 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/11/2006 | Response to Petition | On behalf of Metromedia Restaurant Services, et al. Response to pet/rev. | | |
07/14/2006 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 8/14/06; mlbx rule d/n/a | ||
06/20/2006 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/18/2006 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition for review. | | |
05/18/2006 | Petition for Review | Petition for review filed on behalf of Carole Keeton Strayhorn, et al. | | |
04/26/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's agreed m/e/t to file petition for review granted. Petition for review due n/l/t 5:00 p.m. on 5/19/06. | |
04/25/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Agreed motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed on behalf of Carole Keeton Strayhorn | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/30/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/7-B-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
S & A Restaurant Corporation | Respondent | Mr. Ray H. Langenberg |
Steak & Ale of Texas, Inc. | Respondent | Mr. Ray H. Langenberg |
Strayhorn, Carole Keeton | Petitioner | Mr. David C. Mattax Mr. Edward D. Burbach Ms. Maureen Powers Mr. Gregory Abbott Mr. Barry Ross McBee |
Metromedia Restaurant Services, Inc. | Respondent | Mr. Mark W. Eidman Mr. Ray H. Langenberg |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-05-00006-CV
In Part: Rev&Ren/Rev&Rem
188 SW3d 282, 02-10-06
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Alan Waldrop
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Darlene Byrne
GN401090