Case Information: 44735 | |||
Short Caption: | LOCKRIDGE (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48720 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR040589 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/22/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/22/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-03543 | |
03/09/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-04682 | |
03/11/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | ||
03/23/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-05683 | |
03/23/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | ||
06/01/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-10691 | |
06/28/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-10832 | |
06/28/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/22/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 29, 2005. | 05-10832 |