judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEITH WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1070
Short Caption:KEITH WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12460-88Filed Date:08/18/1989

Opening Event Date:08/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/04/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/21/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/23/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeith Williams N
Charles H. O'BanionYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven N. Gersten YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, KEITH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MOSES DUBOSE JR. NOTE - 01
08/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/28/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES H. O'BANION, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM TANNER - 7/21/89 PROCEEDING (NO TRIAL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/04/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (51 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD R
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-22-89 AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXPEDITE PRODUCTION OF SUP. CT TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER SUPP REC FILED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXPEDITE PRODUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (351 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012890 SCHPRD RT
04/17/1990RECEIVED OF APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD BA
04/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 21, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 6/21/90. NFX JJ PANELDJDW SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD B
06/21/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/21/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PF PANEL SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD BE
10/23/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/23/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD