Case Information: 44734 | |||
Short Caption: | MCKITTRICK VS. FULLER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46989 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A466017 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/01/2005 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/22/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert M. Apple & Associates Prof. Corp.--check no. 1408. | ||
02/22/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03539 | |
03/01/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/17/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | ||
03/25/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Robert M. Apple re: proposed stip. to dismiss. | 05-05879 | |
03/25/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Stephen E. Haberfeld. (letter from Robert M. Apple) | ||
03/28/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Robert M. Apple stating that appellant McKittrick intends to dismiss his appeal. | 05-05956 | |
03/29/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Civil Appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b). | 05-06131 | |
04/04/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge recommends that this Court remove this appeal from the settlement conference program. | 05-06555 | |
04/06/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 05-06710 | |
04/06/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |