judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SEAN VALENTINE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1067
Short Caption:SEAN VALENTINE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 88-CF-0086 Consolidated:89-CF-1067
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6082-87Filed Date:08/16/1989

Opening Event Date:08/16/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/24/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/08/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/24/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSean Valentine N
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kenneth F. Whitted YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901VALENTINE, SEAN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-86 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 8/15/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 02 BY 9/3/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 03 10/8/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 03 IF ANY, DUE BY 10/28/91; SCHED NOTE - 04 CASE ON DEC 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/12/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STOLKERR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WHITTEDK FOR - APPELLEE
08/16/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/01/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989ORDER SS, CONS 88-86 & 89-1067;RICH STOLKER APPTD FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD DSA
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(148 PGS/ASHBOCK-J&J-TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989STATEMENT IN RE TO 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD R
10/23/1990LETTER TO APLT RE STATUS OF CASE SL PANELFF SCDATE 102290 SCHPRD TT
04/22/1991RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: DELAY IN APPEAL PROCESS, ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1991LETTER REFERRING 4/18/91 LTR FROM APLT TO COUNSEL SL PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1991RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF APPEAL AND RPA TO LETTER DATED 5/22/91 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1991ORDER SS, CONS 88-86 & 89-1067; BRF OF APLT IN THIS CASE DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061091 SCHPRD U
07/24/1991RECORD COMPLETED
08/15/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
09/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 090691 SCHPRD V
09/05/1991RECEIVED APLT BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT LV TO FL BA, LODGED BA FILED. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 091291 SCHPRD K
10/08/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 100891 SCHPRD BE
10/08/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/05/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/05/1991ARGUED PANELSCWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1992AFFIRMED MOJ affirming the judgment on appeal (SCWGGA)
01/03/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/24/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1992RECEIVED pro se letter from appellant re: petitioning the U.S. Supreme Court.