Case Information: 42768 | |||
Short Caption: | HODGKINS (EDWIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40309 , 41088 , 49946 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C171782 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 04-02551 | |
02/17/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion. Ex-Parte Application for Withdrawal of Counsel before Final Determination. | 04-02993 | |
02/17/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 04-02996 | |
02/20/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Motion to Withdraw). | 04-03325 | |
02/20/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-03349 | |
02/20/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/25/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On February 17, 2004, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this appeal. Counsel may not withdraw until she has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). Specifically, counsel must first file a fast track statement. The motion to withdraw is therefore denied. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 04-03591 | |
03/01/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Copy filed in district court on February 24, 2004 (not certified.) | 04-03875 | |
03/18/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 04-05166 | |
03/26/2004 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 2, 2004. | 04-05736 | |
04/05/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-06184 | |
04/05/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 04-06185 | |
04/08/2004 | Other | Other. Received table of contents to Appellant's Fast Track Statement. Placed inside front cover of appendix. | ||
04/27/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-07734 | |
04/27/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 04-07735 | |
06/15/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. | 04-10969 | |
07/16/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on July 6, 2004. | 04-13043 | |
11/15/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[Although this court has elected to file the appendix submitted, it is noted that it does not comply with the arrangement and form requirements of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Counsel is cautioned that failure to comply with the requirements for appendices in the future may result in the appendix being returned, unfiled, to be correctly prepared. See NRAP 32(c). Failure to comply may also result in the imposition of sanctions by this court. NRAP 3C(n).] NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-20911 | |
12/10/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-21198 | |
12/10/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/20/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 13, 2004. | 04-21198 |