judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERVING N. BOND, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1186
Short Caption:ERVING N. BOND, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14464-88Filed Date:10/05/1989

Opening Event Date:10/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/19/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:09/25/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/06/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErving N. Bond, Jr.N
Jensen E. Barber YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
William R. CowdenNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOND JR., ERVING N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/09/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BARBERJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - COWDENW FOR - APPELLEE
10/05/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JENSEN E. BARBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD DSA
10/31/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR PIRFO CERTIFICATION OF 9/28/89 PROC. (NOT W/JUDGE THIS DATE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
12/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RT(402-PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
02/26/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR WRAY CERTIFICATION OF 9/28/89 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(296 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD RT
03/19/1990RECORD COMPLETED
10/01/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092590 SCHPRD CHECK
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 17, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BA
11/09/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 12/17/90. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD B
12/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD BA
01/16/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL W/IN 10 DAYS FR DTD OF ORDER. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 010891 SCHPRD B
01/28/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 012891 SCHPRD BA
02/25/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 29, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022091 SCHPRD BE
02/28/1991ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 3/29/91. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022791 SCHPRD B
04/01/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 4, 1991 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991ORDER GRANT APLE MO EXT. TIME TO FL BRF; BE IS FILED. SCHD AS SOON AD CAL PERMITS. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 041891 SCHPRD K
04/19/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/26/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/25/1991ARGUED PANELTESTFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1992AFFIRMED Judgment AF judgment of conviction (TE ST FA)
10/06/1992MANDATE ISSUED
01/05/1994RECEIVED letter from pro-se appellant in re to the disposition of this case.
01/12/1994LETTER in response to 1/5/94 letter from appellant (JAC)
09/09/2020FiledArchived