judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERTO MATOS MARTINEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1063
Short Caption:ROBERTO MATOS MARTINEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5170-83Filed Date:08/10/1989

Opening Event Date:08/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/31/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/01/1991
Argued/Submitted:09/24/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/22/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoberto Matos Martinez N
Elaine J. Mittleman NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Kenneth F. Whitted YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MATOS, ROBERTO UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 05/03/90 ORD: GRANTNG MOT FOR NOTE - 01 APTMT OF COUNSEL AND APTG NOTE - 02 RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. AS NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT; FO COUNSEL, NOTE - 03 W/IN 20 DAYS, TO ADVISE WHTR NOTE - 03 HE INTENDS TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 04 PREPARED FOR THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 06/07/90 ORD: DIRG COUNSEL NOTE - 05 FOR APLT TO COMPLY WITH THIS NOTE - 06 COURT'S ORD OF 5/3/90, W/I 10 NOTE - 06 DAYS, OR HIS APTMT SHALL BE NOTE - 07 VACATED AND HIS NAME REMOVED NOTE - 07 FROM PANEL OF CJA ATTORNEYS. NOTE - 08 06/29/90 ORD: GRANTING MOTION NOTE - 08 & VACATING APTMT OF RICHARD S NOTE - 09 STOLKER, ESQ. & APPTG LAWRENCE NOTE - 09 M. BASKIR, ESQ. AS COUNSEL; FO NOTE - 10 NEW COUNSEL TO FILE STMT W/IN NOTE - 10 10 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER RT NOTE - 11 WILL BE ORDERED & PREPARED FOR NOTE - 11 PURPOSES OF THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 12 02/14/91 ORD: APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 12 STRIKE COUNS'S APPEARANCE & NOTE - 13 HAVE NEW COUNS APPOINTD IS NOTE - 13 GRANTD & APPNTM OF LAWRENCE NOTE - 14 BASKIR, ESQ, IS VAC & ELAINE NOTE - 14 MITTLEMAN, ESQ, IS APPOINTD TO NOTE - 15 REPRESENT APLT HEREIN; F/O BRF NOTE - 15 OF APLT TO BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS.
01/01/1906 STOLKERR VACATED 6/29/90 BASKIRL VACATED 2/14/91
08/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1989ORDER SS, APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD DSA
11/16/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD R
03/12/1990ORDER APPELLANT IS DIRECTED W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE BRIEF OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED JB PANELRO SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT MOF FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (SEE MOTION) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
04/17/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE: PENDING MOTIONS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990LETTER FROM APLT RE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE SUDA DATED 4-30-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LAWRENCE M. BASKIR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 11) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990STATEMENT OF COUNSEL RE TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD SRT
10/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (16 PGS. -- SALAZAR) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE COUNSEL'S APPERANCE TO HAVE NEW COUNSEL APPOINTED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(14 PGS/HOLLAND) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT MO FOR CLARITY FOR THE ABOVE CAPTURED CASE WHICH HAS NOT BEEN ADDRESSED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/31/1990FiledRecord Completed
12/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(22 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 120590 SCHPRD RT
02/08/1991LETTER OF APLT RE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1991COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELANT'S COUNSEL (EX PARTE) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELAINE MITTLEMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12 THRU 15 GW PANELRO SCDATE 013191 SCHPRD V
03/26/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (6-PGS/JOYNER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1991FiledBriefing Completed
05/01/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 043091 SCHPRD BE
05/20/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1991LETTER TO APLT RESPONDING TO LTR TO CHIEF JUDGE RE STATUS OF CASE. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE ADDENDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/24/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT'S ORDER PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/22/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD