judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VINCE RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1136
Short Caption:VINCE RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2825-88Filed Date:07/13/1989

Opening Event Date:07/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/19/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/02/1992
Argued/Submitted:09/01/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/25/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVince Richardson N
Jennifer P. LymanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James M. Silver YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RICHARDSON, VINCE UNITED STATES
01/01/1902FOR RT
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/12/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 8/27/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/1/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/21/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 JANUARY 1992 CALENDAR; NFX. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 07/30/91 ORD: CNSL MO TO NOTE - 04 VACATE ADVANCED BRFNG ORDER NOTE - 05 OF 7/12/91 GRNTD. F/O THE NOTE - 05 APPEARANCE OF ROBERT NOTE - 06 DINERSTEIN, ESQ. IS HEREBY NOTE - 06 VACATED & JENNIFER P. LYMAN NOTE - 07 IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT NOTE - 07 APPELLANT HEREIN.
01/01/1906 DINERSTEINR VACATED 7/30/91
07/13/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/29/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT DINERSTEIN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD CHECK
10/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03 GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062191 SCHPRD GR
07/19/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO VACATE BRIEFING SCHD PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 07 GR PANELJWR SCDATE 072491 SCHPRD GR
08/13/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (10 PGS. -- RONAN) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (314 PGS. -- BURNS) (4/19/89 - 4/21/89 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 092191 SCHPRD RT
09/19/1991RECORD COMPLETED
03/24/1992ORDER Appellant to advise this court within 10 days whether any additional record is required for this appeal. Failure to advise court in 10 days will result in the issuance of a briefing order. (By JEP)
04/13/1992The brief of appellant shall be filed no later than May 29, 1992, the brief of appellee shall be filed no later than July 3, 1992, and th e reply brief of appellant, if any, shall be filed no later than July 22, 1992; this case shall be placed on the calendar of September 1992. As these dates have been set to enable the court to schedule this case on this calendar, any requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By JEP)
05/27/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/02/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
07/02/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/18/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
08/18/1992RECEIVED aplt's reply brief
08/20/1992VOTE SHEET appellant's motion for leave to file reply brief out of time, and the lodged reply brief
08/27/1992ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
08/27/1992APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF is filed
09/01/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/01/1992ARGUED (SC WG KG) Jennifer P. Lyman, Esq. for appellant; James M. Silver, Esq. for appellee.
09/04/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (SC WG KG)
09/25/1992MANDATE ISSUED