judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL C. HURT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1132
Short Caption:MICHAEL C. HURT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13521-88Filed Date:09/22/1989

Opening Event Date:09/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael C. Hurt N
Robert M. Greenspan NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HURT, MICHAEL C. UNITED STATES
09/22/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM FRANKLIN - 6/19/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT M. GREENSPAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR HART CERTIFICATION OF 7/25/89 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT CALLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (9 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 112589 SCHPRD R
10/24/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
11/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (234 PGS GOAD) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(4 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(74 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD RT
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (4 PGS. -- BOSTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT MO TO X TI TO SUBMIT AFFIDAVIT UNTIL MARCH 15, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/21/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO WITHDRAW & DISMISS APPEAL. GW PANELRO SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD V
03/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
04/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD