judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON (JAMMIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44744
Short Caption:JACKSON (JAMMIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43095 , 49032 , 52015
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197430Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/21/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-03620
03/01/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 05-04002
03/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 44715/ 44744/ 44745/ 44746 – cases are not consolidated. 05-04380
03/21/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-05455
03/21/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/02/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record. A transcript of the hearing held on December 29, 2003 is necessary for this court's review of this appeal. If a transcript has been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If a transcript has not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. The clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed within which to transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 05-08534
06/13/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. regarding the order filed on May 2, 2005. The transcript for December 29, 2003 has not been filed. 05-11560
09/06/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/29/03. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 05-17505
09/06/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/29/03. 05-17533
10/18/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response from the State due: 30 days. 05-20577
11/22/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-23065
04/20/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. We conclude that oral argument and briefing are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn11[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and we conclude that appellant is entitled only to the relief described herein. This order constitutes our final disposition. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] NNP06-RR/MD/RP 06-08418
05/16/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08768
05/16/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. 06-08768