judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC CUNNINGHAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1127
Short Caption:ERIC CUNNINGHAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7503-88Filed Date:09/21/1989

Opening Event Date:09/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/20/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Cunningham N
David J. Sitomer YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Ralph J. Caccia YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CUNNINGHAM, ERIC UNITED STATES
09/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID J. SITOMER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM RHOADES - 7/13/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
11/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (12 PGS. -- TREMEL) AJ PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD R
12/11/1989STATEMENT OF APLT RE: TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED IN THIS COURT JB PANELRBH SCDATE 121389 SCHPRD U
01/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (60-PGS/HUNT PROC. 5/8/89) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022590 SCHPRD RT
02/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (162 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (102-PGS/HUNT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040890 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1990STATEMENT OF APLT REPORT TO THE COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990ORDER DIRG APLT'S BRIEF BE FILED WITHIN 40 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (71 PGS. -- SWAGERTY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD BA
06/14/1990ORDER APLT MO X TM GRNTD AND APLT BF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30 DAYS FRM DATE OF THIS ORDER. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD GR
07/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BA
08/20/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/20/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART MOJ AF IN PART & RM TO TRIAL CT TO VACATE UUV CONVICTION PANELBESTPR SCDATE 121990 SCHPRD RDEC
01/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD