Case Information: 44747 | |||
Short Caption: | TURNER, JR. (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42318 , 46738 , 49567 , 51706 , 54518 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178102 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/23/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/23/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-03636 | |
03/22/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-05557 | |
04/19/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-06127 | |
04/19/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/05/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2005. | 05-06127 |