judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARTIN E. BUTLER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1138
Short Caption:MARTIN E. BUTLER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1914-89Filed Date:09/27/1989

Opening Event Date:09/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/15/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/26/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/20/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMartin E. Butler N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William R. CowdenYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BUTLER, MARTIN E. AKA MARTIN E. ARRINGTON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/10/90 ORD: WITH TRIAL JUDGE NOTE - 01 FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT, NOTE - 02 F/O APLT TO FILE STATE W/IN 20 NOTE - 02 DYS INDICATING WHETHER RT WILL NOTE - 03 BE PREPARED & APPROXIMATE NOTE - 03 COMPLETION DATE. NOTE - 04 10/12/90 ORD: FAILURE TO REPLY NOTE - 04 WILL PROMPT BRIEFING ORDER.
09/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
12/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (71-PGS/PAVLISH) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/02/1990RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM SHELTON - 7/27/89 PROCEEDING (VOIR DIRE) JB PANEL SCDATE 030390 SCHPRD RT
01/04/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD V
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(36 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (102-PGS/LEWIS) JT PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(200 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD RT
05/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER ENTIRE SUPP. RECORD HAS BEEN FILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD BA
09/10/1990ORDER DENIED APLT'S MO TO EXTENT W/O PREJUDICE TO APLT'S FILING MOTION (SEE NOTES 1 & 3) JB PANELRO SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD U
10/12/1990ORDER APLT IS DIRECTED TO FILE STATE TO THIS COURT'S 9/10/90 ORDER. (SEE NOTE 3) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD U
11/05/1990ORDER BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL W/IN 40 DAYS OF ORDER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD B
12/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD BA
01/15/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/15/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 011591 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/26/1991SUBMITTED PANELBEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/20/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD