judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM C. SWEENEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1139
Short Caption:WILLIAM C. SWEENEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6855-88Filed Date:09/19/1989

Opening Event Date:09/19/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/28/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam C. Sweeney N
Annie R. Alexander YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SWEENEY, WILLIAM C. AKA JAMES SWING UNITED STATES
09/19/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANNIE ALEXANDER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
12/14/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD R
02/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (10 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/28/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (308 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 10 DAYS JB FVH PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BA
05/01/1990RECEIVED APPELLANTS' BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/01/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD