judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BROWNER, FERRIS N. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-0220
Short Caption:BROWNER, FERRIS N. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Lead:86-CT-0220Consolidated: 86-CT-0221
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:D909-84Filed Date:01/16/1986

Opening Event Date:01/16/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/20/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/12/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFerris N. Browner NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
W. Edward Thompson YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Lincoln Woodward NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Edward E. SchwabYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWNER, FERRIS N. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RITA A. WALKER NOTE - 01 DC:ENGAGING IN BUSINESS OF NOTE - 02 LOANING MONEY WITHOUT A NOTE - 02 LICENSE NOTE - 03 5/14/86 ORD: SUA SPONTE NOTE - 03 CONSOLIDATING NOS. 86-220 AND NOTE - 04 86-221 FOR ALL PURPOSES. FURTH NOTE - 04 ORD. THAT CLK IS DIRECTED TO NOTE - 05 FILE LODGED DR/SRT; APLT'S NOTE - 05 BRIEF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD NOTE - 06 ON APPEAL IS FILED NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 CON: 86-221 NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 2/25/87 ORD: DENYING MO OF NOTE - 08 JOHNNY & MILDRED WILLIAMS AND NOTE - 09 ROBERT ATLANE LEE TO INTERVENE NOTE - 09 W/OUT PREJUDICE TO MOVANTS' NOTE - 10 FILING FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT A NOTE - 10 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE; BRIEFS OF NOTE - 11 APPELLANTS DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 7/8/87 ORD:GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 12 FOR LV TO FL RESPONSE & CLK TO NOTE - 13 FL LODGED RESPONSE; CLK TO FL NOTE - 13 LODGED EXHIBITS REFERRED TO IN NOTE - 14 APLT'S MO; GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 14 FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO NOTE - 15 EXTENT THAT BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 15 IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - THOMPSONWE FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - SCHWABE FOR - APPELLEE
01/16/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/18/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC-DISM (NO DR,SRT, OR FEE) TTC PANELPY SCDATE 012786 SCHPRD DR
04/04/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1986RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DR & SRT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1986RECEIVED APLT'S RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 032886 SCHPRD ANSA
04/11/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 6 SL PANELPY SCDATE 042186 SCHPRD OPE
05/23/1986RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 071486 SCHPRD R
07/30/1986MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE OF JOHNNY & MILDRED WILLIAMS, AND ROBERT & ATLANE LEE ON BEHALF OF APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1986APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE RJG PANEL SCDATE 080586 SCHPRD OPA
08/15/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (384 PGS - MACK) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (202 PGS - SHEPARD) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1986RECEIVED APLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1986FiledRecord Completed
10/20/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (265 PGS - SANBORN) GG PANEL SCDATE 083086 SCHPRD RT
10/23/1986RECEIVED INTERVENOR'S REPLY TO APLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-11 CWC PANELNBFE SCDATE 102086 SCHPRD CHECK
04/06/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER EXHIBITS ARE LOCATED OR IN THE ALTERNA- TIVE TO DISMISS JB PANEL SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF & DISMISSAL/W EXHIBITS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILED BRIEF AND TO DISMISS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12-15. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 040987 SCHPRD RBH
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD EXHIBITS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081987 SCHPRD BA
11/09/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 17TH JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD BA
11/25/1987ORDER CASE DISMISSED DUE TO LACK OF FLNG BRF OF APLT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD DDW
12/01/1987ORDER CRT ORD OF 11/25/87 VACATED; BRF OF APLTS DUE BY 12/7/87 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 17, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 010888 SCHPRD BE
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD OPA
02/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/29/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1988ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 10 DAYS;ANFX. DAS PANELPYA SCDATE 020488 SCHPRD N
03/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR ORAL HEARING MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988ORDER GRANT PRO SE REQ OF APLTS FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/12/88 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT'S FOR LEAVE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1988APPEARANCE OF W. EDWARD THOMPSON AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT AND TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988ARGUED PANELPYMKSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELMKSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 549 A.2d 1107
11/08/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 2355
12/01/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD