judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOYD, CYNTHIA A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1734
Short Caption:BOYD, CYNTHIA A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7881-86Filed Date:12/16/1986

Opening Event Date:12/16/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David Rosenthal YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard L. Chamovitz YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOYD, CYNTHIA A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/2/88 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 01 TO FL 23-110 MO IN TRL CRT IN NOTE - 02 30 DAYS W/COPY TO THIS CRT; MO NOTE - 02 FOR STAY HELD IN ABEY PENDG NOTE - 03 FLNG OF 23-110 MO. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 FOR CONSID. BEFORE A MERITS NOTE - 04 DIV. AS SOON AS THE CALENDAR NOTE - 05 PERMITS NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/02 ACTION - MEMO ATTY 1 - ROSENTHALD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CHAMOVITZR FOR - APPELLEE
12/16/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1986APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 021687 SCHPRD R
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID ROSENTHAL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 032787 SCHPRD DSA
04/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (30 PGS. - RONAN) PM PANEL SCDATE 041387 SCHPRD RT
07/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/16/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (ORDERS) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 082587 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO THE EXTENT APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD OPE
09/04/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO AUGUST 27TH COURT ORDER REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 091687 SCHPRD STATE
10/28/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(119 PGS. -- MATO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
11/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED MLH PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
11/24/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. PANELPY SCDATE 111987 SCHPRD EBP
02/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (146 PGS TR - MAJORS) GT PANEL SCDATE 010188 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO THIRTY DAYS AFTER TRAN- SCRIPT IS COMPLETED PB PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD BA
04/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (79 PGS - ARTIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD M
05/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PROCEEDINGS JB PANEL SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD BA
06/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD Q
07/05/1988RECEIVED APLT'S 23-110 MOTION FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070488 SCHPRD ANSA
08/17/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TR CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD CHECK
08/24/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 17TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD STATE
11/08/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OR MO IN TR CT. (23-110) EBP PANELRO SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD CHECK
11/21/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS OF 23-110 MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD STATE
01/19/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL CT. (23-110) EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/27/1989STATEMENT RE STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS AD PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD STATE
07/28/1989ORDER SS, APLT TO FL STATEMENT IN 10 DAYS RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO PENDING IN THE TRIAL CRT. ACG PANELRBH SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD CHECK
08/07/1989STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD STATE
09/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (ORDER) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989ORDER APLT'S BRIEF DUE IN 40 DAYS. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD M
12/22/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122289 SCHPRD BA
01/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 21, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD BE
02/16/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-23-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/23/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD V
03/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 27, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD BE
03/27/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL LODGE BRF & APPEAL SHALL BE SCHEDULE SEE NOTE FIELD 04 THRU 05. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD B
09/11/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/11/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE ORDER THIS CASE TO BE ARGUED ON 11/2/90 AT 9:30AM MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990MEMORANDUM ARGUED BEFORE JJ RG/SC/PY PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1991REMANDED ORDER REMANDING CAUSE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AS SET FORTH IN OPINION PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 586 A.2d 670
01/07/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0001 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0000
01/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING THE STATUS OF CASE ON REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING STATEMENT RE REMAND FOR INFO TO DIVISION. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 050691 SCHPRD CHECK