judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VIGNEUX VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Information: 44730
Short Caption:VIGNEUX VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A454161Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/04/2005 / Gang, LeonardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/18/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/22/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
02/22/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Brenske & Christensen--check no. 02816.
02/22/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-03516
03/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/17/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
03/29/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provided Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-06089
04/04/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-06609
05/26/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-10421
06/07/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-11149
06/29/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days.
07/08/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/18/04. To Court Reporter: S. Briggs & S. Graham 05-13562
09/06/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remand for Order Granting Good Faith Settlement Determination. 05-17487
09/26/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. addressed to Court Reporters Stacy Briggs/Sherry Graham from James R. Christensen regarding transcripts for this appeal. 05-19101
09/28/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. 05-19230
10/26/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Limited Remand, Regarding Transcripts and Disapproving Stipulation. We grant D'Ambrosio's unopposed motion and remand this matter to the district court pursuant to its certification. Copy of the district court's order or a status report from D'Ambrosio or if the motion for good faith settlement is granted, the parties shall file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal as to D'Ambrosio due: 60 days. Appellants' appeal as to respondent Sunrise Hospital Medical Center, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company, will continue to remain pending in this court absent a similar stipulation or motion to dismiss. As appellants' transcript request form was served on the wrong court reporters, Ms. Briggs and Ms. Graham are not obligated to file the requested transcript conducted on October 18, 2004. Amended proof of service indicating that the transcript request form has been served on Ms. Heishman from appellants due: 15 days. Pending resolution of D'Ambrosio's motion to remand, we suspend the briefing schedule. We disapprove the stipulation to extend the time for filing the opening brief and appendix. 05-21204
11/10/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant's Amended Request for Transcript. Transcripts requested: 10/18/04. To Court Reporter: Tessa Heishmann. 05-22235
11/16/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal as to the D'Ambrosio Respondents Only. 05-22555
12/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Apepal and to file Proof of Service. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is dismissed as to respondents Francis G. D'Ambrosio, M.D., Individually, Francis G. D'Ambrosio, M.D., Inc., a Nevada Professional Corporation d/b/a Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates and Francis G. D'Ambrosio, M.D. Spine Inc., a Nevada Professional Corporation d/b/a Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Amended proof of service from appellants due: 15 days. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 05-24056
12/23/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. We reinstate briefing for this appeal. fn1[The parties' November 16, 2005, stipulation did not stipulate to dismiss Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates. In the event that the parties' intend to dismiss Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates, they shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss it.] Opening brief and appendix due: 30 days. 05-25053
01/11/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Request for Transcript on court reporter Tessa Heishmann. 06-00800
01/12/2006Order/Procedural Order. due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Heishman shall within the same time period, file a motion or the requested transcript cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 06-00870
01/26/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on John H. Cotton & Assoc. 06-02035
01/26/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-02036
02/03/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/18/04. Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. 06-02563
02/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Opening Brief and Appendix on Respondent Counsel John H. Cotton. 06-02619
02/08/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal as to Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates. 06-02799
02/23/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. Sunrise Hospital Medical Center. 06-04086
03/08/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. This appeal is dismissed as to respondent Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates, an Association of Nevada Professional Corporations. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Reply brief due: 30 days. 06-05059
03/29/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-06593
10/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-21483
10/18/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP07-NB/JH/RP
12/01/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07B-NB/JH/RP 06-24581
12/27/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-26024
12/27/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/04/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2006. 06-26024