judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GERALD C. KANCEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1062
Short Caption:GERALD C. KANCEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8377-88Filed Date:08/10/1989

Opening Event Date:08/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:03/28/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGerald C. Kancey N
Marvin E. Clemons YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven J. Mccool YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KANCEY, GERALD C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: KENNETH L. GRANT NOTE - 01
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARVIN E. CLEMONS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD DSA
10/04/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (256 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD R
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (92 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012890 SCHPRD RT
07/30/1990ORDER APPELLANT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-28-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD BA
09/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM FL LODGED BRF & APLE'S BRF SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100490 SCHPRD B
11/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BE
03/28/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEBEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELFEBEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/14/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD