judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMAR JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1061
Short Caption:JAMAR JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10210-88Filed Date:08/16/1989

Opening Event Date:08/16/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/02/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/20/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJamar Jenkins N
William H. Edmisten YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William R. CowdenYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, JAMAR UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANTHONY WHITE NOTE - 01
08/16/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM H. EDMISTEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD DSA
11/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL 120-PGS (HOLLAND) AJ PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD R
12/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAY EXTENSION GG PANEL SCDATE 010690 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF 01/26/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 011190 SCHPRD V
02/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD BA
02/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(116 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MOT ONLY TO EXT THAT BRIEF TO BE FILED W/ IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 ADDITIONAL DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(9 PGS/HOLLAND) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 042490 SCHPRD U
07/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(72 PGS/HOLLAND) AD PANEL SCDATE 100490 SCHPRD RT
07/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-1-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 09-01-90. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD GR
08/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (94-PGS/GRAYBILL) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO ONLY TO THE EXT BRF FL IN 10 DAYS. MAY RESULT IN APPOINMT VACATED.GW PANELRO SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD V
09/28/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092890 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1990FiledBriefing Completed
11/02/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 110290 SCHPRD BE
03/20/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/20/1991SUBMITTED PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL/ CAUSE RM TO VACATE UUV & 1 MDP CONVICTION. PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD