judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PERKINS (JEFFERY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34768
Short Caption:PERKINS (JEFFERY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154930Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08256
09/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. 99-08712
10/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: October 11, 1999. 99-10456
10/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: October 12, 1999. 99-10458
11/05/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Scott L. Bindrup shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-10860
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-05488
04/19/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Counsel's Response to Order filed November 5, 1999. 00-06242
04/19/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Late Filing of Counsel's Response to Order filed November 5, 1999, or, in the Alternative Motion to Continue time to file Fast Track Statement. 00-06243
04/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 5, 2000, this court entered an order directing Scott L. Bindrup to file the fast track statement within 10 days or show cause why Bindrup should not be sanctioned. On April 19, 2000, Bindrup filed a response to this court' s order. Bindrup shall, within 5 days from the date of this order, file on behalf of appellant a transcript request form or a certificate stating that no transcript is required in this appeal. Further, Bindrup shall file a fast track statement within 30 days of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. Bindrup is cautioned that continued failure to comply with NRAP 3C and orders of this court may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions. Fn1[On April 19, 2000, Bindrup filed a motion for late filing of response to this court's order. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. 00-06922
06/01/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-09267
06/01/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-09268
06/22/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-10686
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15259
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15430
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15430