judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREW JOHN YELLOWBEAR, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-27)
Case Number:06-27Case Docketed On:02/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:ANDREW JOHN YELLOWBEAR, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANDREW JOHN YELLOWBEAR, JR., Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerAndrew John Yellowbear Jr. Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/15/2006Petition - Writ - certiorariPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
02/15/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
02/16/2006Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
02/17/2006Motion - Stay - other (Proceedings in trial court). Defendant is going to forward original signature page.MotionStay - otherFinal
02/22/2006Motion - Stay - other (Proceedings in trial court) (original signature).MotionStay - otherFinal
02/27/2006Motion - Stay - other (Proceedings in trial court) (Original).MotionStay - otherFinal
02/28/2006Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
02/28/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/08/2006Service - Mail returned. Received copy of order denying petition for writ of certiorari/review sent to petitioner, "no longer at this address RETURN TO SENDER."ServiceMail returnedFinal