Case Information: 44725 | |||
Short Caption: | RANS VS. MASTER PROTECTION CORP. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0101119 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/01/2005 / Olsen, Philip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Law Office of Richard C. Blower--check no. 6759. | ||
02/18/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03383 | |
03/01/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/04/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-04297 | |
04/27/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 7, 2005. | 05-08329 | |
06/09/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 05-11379 | |
07/18/2005 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 05-14249 | |
07/20/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 05-14386 | |
07/20/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |