judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GAINES, WILLIE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-0343
Short Caption:GAINES, WILLIE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T2256-85Filed Date:02/14/1986

Opening Event Date:02/14/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/10/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/20/1987
Argued/Submitted:06/15/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Philip Clarke Baten YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Victor E. LongYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GAINES, WILLIE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
02/14/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/10/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/20/1987FiledBriefing Completed
06/15/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/17/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition