Case Information: 44726 | |||
Short Caption: | RODGERS VS. MALCOLM | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI15839 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/01/2005 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/22/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of William R. Kendall--check no. 8601. | ||
02/22/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03451 | |
03/01/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/09/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 05-04760 | |
03/11/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement. | 05-04934 | |
05/16/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 05-09481 | |
06/07/2005 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 05-11194 | |
06/16/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 05-11826 | |
06/16/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |