judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARVELL R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1016
Short Caption:ARVELL R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13065-88Filed Date:08/18/1989

Opening Event Date:08/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArvell R. Williams N
Boniface K. CobbinaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, ARVELL R. UNITED STATES
08/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BONIFACE K. COBBINA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS GT PANEL SCDATE 090789 SCHPRD DSA
09/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MEH PANEL SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD M
10/26/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (211 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD R
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 MORE DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR A PERIOD OF 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF WITHIN 10 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD V
03/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD BA
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 7 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 10 DAYS FROM THE DTD OF THIS ORDER. JJ PANELDJDW SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD B
06/28/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BA W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE MAY RESULT IN HIS APTMT BEING VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD V
07/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-13-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BA
07/20/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; APLE BRF IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD B
09/17/1990ORDER APLE TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE TO BE SCHED ON REC ON APPEAL & APLT'S BRF ALONE. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD B
10/01/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 102790 SCHPRD BE
10/12/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/12/1990ORDER APLE'S MO IS GRANTED & THE APPEAL IS HEREBY REMANDED. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD B
10/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE