Case Information: 44716 | |||
Short Caption: | CHILD (CARTER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFO020561 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-03355 | |
02/18/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: January 21, 2005. Court Reporter: Liz Setterman. Filed in district court on: February 15, 2005. | 05-03356 | |
02/25/2005 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/21/05. Court Reporter: Liz Fetterman. | ||
03/03/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Agreement to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal pursuant to Rule 42 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. | 05-04214 | |
05/04/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On March 3, 2005, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-08714 | |
05/04/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |