judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH Q. LEWIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0163
Short Caption:JOSEPH Q. LEWIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1430-85Filed Date:02/16/1987

Opening Event Date:02/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/17/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/21/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/06/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Q. Lewis N
Melinda Douglas NN
AppellantJoseph Q. Lewis N
Joel F. Brenner YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edith S. Marshall YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEWIS, JOSEPH Q. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FE: FRAUD NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/04/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRENNERJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MARSHALLE FOR - APPELLEE
02/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MELINDA DOUGLAS, ESQ, PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1987MEMORANDUM ATTY DOUGLAS PHONED IN (SHE DOESN'T WANT THIS CASE) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOEL F. BRENNER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 041787 SCHPRD R
04/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
06/17/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (22 PGS - MOORE) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS. - CARTER) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD BA
09/16/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/21/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/21/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF & APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD BE
11/02/1987APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 11/25/87 OF APPELLANT (NO OPE) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD RBA
02/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988LETTER LETTER GRANTING REQ OF ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 4/5/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 021088 SCHPRD OPE
04/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/05/1988ARGUED PANELPYTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELPYTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD