judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM H. SMITH, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0159
Short Caption:WILLIAM H. SMITH, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1956-86Filed Date:02/09/1987

Opening Event Date:02/09/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam H. Smith, Jr.N
Daniel M. Schember NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH JR., WILLIAM H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 031688 ORDER: CLK OF SUP CT TO NOTE - 01 TRANSMIT RT OF 11/26 - 12/1/86 NOTE - 02 PROCEEDINGS TO THIS CT AS A NOTE - 02 SUP RECORD FORTHWITH; FO: APLT NOTE - 03 BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS NOTE - 03 FILED & APLE BR DUE 30 DAYS NOTE - 04 THEREAFTER. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NOTE - 05 40 DAYS THEREAFTER MLH
02/09/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT EBP PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD BA
09/02/1987ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAY TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RE EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080187 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1987APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO SEPTEMBER 2ND COURT ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT TO OCTOBER 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD STATE
09/25/1987RECEIVED ANSWER OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 9/2/87 RE TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO CLK TO FILE LDGD STATE; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD OPE
10/22/1987STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO 9/2 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 10/22/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (142 PGS - GLEASON) JB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
04/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD BA
04/04/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PREPARATION OF VOIR DIRE TRANSCRIPT & (NOTE 5 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/08/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/08/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD V
04/08/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE