Case Information: 44710 | |||
Short Caption: | STONEWEAR, INC. VS. LOCKHEED PARTNERS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44146 , 44670 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0400819A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/20/2005 / Eisenberg, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/17/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/17/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03219 | |
02/17/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/31/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jones Vargas--check no. 57533. | ||
03/31/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | 05-06370 | |
04/15/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Jones Vargas). | 05-07416 | |
07/20/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/01/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 05-17344 | |
09/01/2005 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 05-17345 | |
09/13/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 05-18033 | |
09/13/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |