judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EUGENE T. HILL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1168
Short Caption:EUGENE T. HILL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14282-88Filed Date:10/13/1989

Opening Event Date:10/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEugene T. Hill N
Walter S. BoothNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HILL, EUGENE T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 02/21/91 ORD: DENIY COUNS MO NOTE - 01 FOR APLT W/O PREJ TO IT RENEWA NOTE - 02 UPON FL IN TRL CRT OF A MO NOTE - 02 PURS TO D.C. CODE 23-110, & NOTE - 03 FL OF A COPY OF THAT MO W/ NOTE - 03 THIS CRT. NOTE - 04 03/25/91 ORD: GRANTG COUNS MO NOTE - 04 FOR APLT TO STAY BRF SCHD & NOTE - 05 APPEAL IS STAYED PENDG F/O OF NOTE - 05 THIS CRT; F/O COUNS FOR APLT NOTE - 06 TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 NOTE - 06 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO NOTE - 07 FL IN TRL CRT. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 04/11/91 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S NOTE - 08 MO TO REMAND, & APPEAL IS NOTE - 09 HEREBY REMANDED TO TRL CR FOR NOTE - 09 ENTRY OF AN APPROPRIATE ORD. NOTE - 10 SEE 90 U.S. APP. D.C. 178, F. NOTE - 10 2D 349 (1952).
10/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD R
10/30/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM FRANKLIN - 7/31/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WALTER S. BOOTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
12/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE HUHN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (ORDER OF JUDGE HUHN DATED 1/23/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (13-PGS/FRANKLIN) JT PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD RT
04/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(11 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 032990 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(168-PGS/WHALEN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
09/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (101 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051390 SCHPRD RT
01/11/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (ORDER JUDGE HUHN 12/4/90 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 120790 SCHPRD B
02/04/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE UNTIL AFTER RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 030191 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 GW PANELRO SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD TO
02/26/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPELLANT'S RENEWED RJG PANEL SCDATE 031391 SCHPRD CHECK
03/04/1991NOTICE FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 7. GW PANELRO SCDATE 031491 SCHPRD CHECK
04/11/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/11/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 10. GW PANELRO SCDATE 032991 SCHPRD V
04/11/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/03/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD