judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY E. HAZEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1160
Short Caption:BOBBY E. HAZEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2580-85Filed Date:10/06/1989

Opening Event Date:10/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/15/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/24/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby E. Hazel N
W. Gary KohlmanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin Ohlson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAZEL, BOBBY E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 110789 ORD: SUA SPONTE ORDER NOTE - 01 THIS CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH NOTE - 02 89-1239; APLT W/I 5 DAYS TO NOTE - 02 FILE DSA, DR, SRT & PAY $50 NOTE - 03 DOCKETING FEE, OR APPEAL SHALL NOTE - 03 STAND DISMISSED. NOTE - 04 CON: 87-127, 87-128, 89-1239 NOTE - 04 & 89-1376 NOTE - 05 03/12/90 ORD: 1376 FOR ALL NOTE - 05 PURP; FO APLT'S BRIEF DUE W/IN NOTE - 06 20 DAYS. NFX NOTE - 06
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KOHLMANW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BUNNELLS FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD DSA
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111289 SCHPRD DSA
11/13/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DR
01/03/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD R
02/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN 87-127, 87-128, 89-1239 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (SUPPLEMENTAL)THIS APPEAL W/ 87-127, 87-128, 89-1239, 89-1376 & 89-1387 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 87-127, 87-128, 89-1160, 89-1239 & 89- (SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 - 6) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR UP TO AND INC. 4/16/90. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BA
04/23/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BR GRANTD. APLE'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD OPE
06/15/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/15/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BE
10/04/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL REQ. CASE BE HEARD FIRST ON THE CALENDAR RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S REQUEST TO ALLOW ARGUMENT TO START AT 8:30 AM ON 11/14/90. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOTION TO LATE FILE REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD OPE
10/29/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1990ARGUED PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (21-PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (PRO-SE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT REFER 2 PLEADINGS FROM APLT PRO SE FOR DIRECTION. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE
10/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 3383
11/14/1991APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING TO DECEMBER 2, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REHRG DUE ON OR BEFORE 12/2/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD CHECK
12/02/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 120291 SCHPRD MRHA
01/24/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD