judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID VINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1140
Short Caption:DAVID VINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3481-89Filed Date:09/29/1989

Opening Event Date:09/29/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/23/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/20/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/22/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/14/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Vines N
David Rosenthal YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kenneth F. Whitted YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901VINES, DAVID UNITED STATES
09/29/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID ROSENTHAL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
12/04/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM SWARINGER - 7/27/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
03/23/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (155 PGS. -- GLEASON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD RT
03/26/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF RESEARCH AJ PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRIEF; BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS OF ORDER. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B
07/06/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD BA
01/25/1991ORDER APLE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 081090 SCHPRD BE
02/20/1991FiledBriefing Completed
02/20/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022591 SCHPRD BE
05/22/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/22/1991SUBMITTED PANELSCFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELSCFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/14/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD